open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota

MINNESOTA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:19-43640
    Party Name:Darren Paul McGuire
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik [MNB Close adversary case]
    Date Published:May 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik [MNB Disposition of adversary]
    Date Published:May 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik [MNB Order (Generic)]
    Date Published:May 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik [BNC Certificate of Mailing re: Notice to file claims]
    Date Published:April 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik [MNB Notice of assets and notice to creditors]
    Date Published:April 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik [MNB General notice of settlement or compromise]
    Date Published:April 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:March 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik [MNB Discharge of debtor - Chapter 7]
    Date Published:March 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik [MNB Certificate of service]
    Date Published:March 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik [MNB General notice of abandonment, lease, or sale]
    Date Published:March 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:March 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik [MNB Employ professional - aplcn]
    Date Published:March 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik [MNB US Trustee report in favor of employment]
    Date Published:March 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik [MNB Complaint (fee)]
    Date Published:March 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik [MNB Application to employ professional]
    Date Published:March 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik [MNB Certificate of completion of financial management course]
    Date Published:February 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik [MNB Meeting of creditors concluded- Initial Report on trustee menu]
    Date Published:January 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik [MNB Reaffirmation agreement]
    Date Published:January 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik [BNC Certificate of mailing - Meeting of creditors]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik [MNB Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik [none]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik [MNB Notice of debtor's prior filings]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [MNB Notice of debtor's prior filings]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [MNB Add creditor to matrix]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [MNB Income records of Debtor (payment advices)]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [MNB Notice of responsibilities of chapter 7 debtors and their attorneys]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [MNB Certificate of credit counseling]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [MNB Signature declaration]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [MNB Voluntary chapter 7 petition (fee)]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?464135
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 1 =