open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota

MINNESOTA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:19-33759
    Party Name:Raul Steven Negrete
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sullivan, Patti J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:March 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sullivan, Patti J. [MNB Report of trustee (re: sale, settlement or lease)]
    Date Published:March 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sullivan, Patti J. [MNB Discharge of debtor - Chapter 7]
    Date Published:March 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sullivan, Patti J. [MNB General notice of abandonment, lease, or sale]
    Date Published:February 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sullivan, Patti J. [MNB Certificate of completion of financial management course]
    Date Published:February 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sullivan, Patti J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:January 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sullivan, Patti J. [MNB Order (Generic)]
    Date Published:January 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sullivan, Patti J. [MNB Stipulation or agreement]
    Date Published:January 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sullivan, Patti J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing re: Notice to file claims]
    Date Published:January 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sullivan, Patti J. [MNB Notice of assets and notice to creditors]
    Date Published:December 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sullivan, Patti J. [BNC Certificate of mailing - Meeting of creditors]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sullivan, Patti J. [MNB Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sullivan, Patti J. [MNB Add creditor to matrix]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Add creditor to matrix]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sullivan, Patti J. [MNB Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition (fee) - case upload]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sullivan, Patti J. [MNB Certificate of credit counseling (Case Upload)]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sullivan, Patti J. [MNB Signature declaration (Case Upload)]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sullivan, Patti J. [MNB Notice of responsibilities of chapter 7 debtors and their attorneys (Case Upload)]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sullivan, Patti J. [MNB Income records of Debtor (payment advices) (Case Upload)]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sullivan, Patti J. [none]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition (fee) - case upload]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Certificate of credit counseling (Case Upload)]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Signature declaration (Case Upload)]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Notice of responsibilities of chapter 7 debtors and their attorneys (Case Upload)]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Income records of Debtor (payment advices) (Case Upload)]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [none]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?464171
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 1 =