open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota

MINNESOTA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:20-40437
    Party Name:Caroline Jane Butterfield
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manty, Nauni Jo [BNC Certificate of Mailing re: Notice to file claims]
    Date Published:September 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manty, Nauni Jo [MNB Notice of assets and notice to creditors]
    Date Published:September 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manty, Nauni Jo [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:July 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manty, Nauni Jo [MNB General notice of abandonment, lease, or sale]
    Date Published:July 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manty, Nauni Jo [MNB Discharge of debtor - Chapter 7]
    Date Published:May 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manty, Nauni Jo [MNB Amended schedules and statements (fee for schedules D and E/F)]
    Date Published:May 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manty, Nauni Jo [MNB Meeting of creditors concluded - chapter 7 case]
    Date Published:May 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manty, Nauni Jo [MNB Notice of appearance and request for notice]
    Date Published:May 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manty, Nauni Jo [MNB Order deferring discharge]
    Date Published:April 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manty, Nauni Jo [MNB Notice of non-concluded meeting of creditors - chapter 7 case]
    Date Published:April 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manty, Nauni Jo [MNB Certificate of completion of financial management course]
    Date Published:March 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manty, Nauni Jo [MNB Add creditor to matrix]
    Date Published:March 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manty, Nauni Jo [BNC Certificate of mailing - Meeting of creditors]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manty, Nauni Jo [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manty, Nauni Jo [MNB Rescheduled meeting of creditors - Trustee 341 Filing only]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manty, Nauni Jo [MNB Notice of rescheduled meeting of creditors]
    Date Published:February 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manty, Nauni Jo [MNB Signature declaration]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manty, Nauni Jo [MNB Order on partial case filing]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manty, Nauni Jo [MNB Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [MNB Add creditor to matrix]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [none]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [MNB Signature declaration]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [MNB Income records of Debtor (payment advices)]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [MNB Notice of responsibilities of chapter 7 debtors and their attorneys]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [MNB Voluntary chapter 7 petition (fee)]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [MNB Certificate of credit counseling]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.mnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?465947
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =