open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota

MINNESOTA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:20-60099
    Party Name:ROBERT J STEINBRING
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle [MNB Application for compensation preconfirmation Ch 13]
    Date Published:March 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle [MNB Notice of rescheduled meeting of creditors]
    Date Published:March 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle [MNB Objection to confirmation of ch 13 plan]
    Date Published:March 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle [MNB Notice of appearance and request for notice]
    Date Published:March 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle [BNC Certificate of mailing - Meeting of creditors]
    Date Published:February 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Ch 13 Plan]
    Date Published:February 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle [MNB Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
    Date Published:February 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle [MNB Chapter 13 plan]
    Date Published:February 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle [MNB Income records of Debtor (payment advices)]
    Date Published:February 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle [MNB Chapter 13 completion]
    Date Published:February 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:February 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle [MNB Order on partial case filing]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle [MNB Add creditor to matrix]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 [MNB Add creditor to matrix]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle [MNB Notice of responsibilities of chapter 13 debtors and their attorneys]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 [MNB Notice of responsibilities of chapter 13 debtors and their attorneys]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle [MNB Certificate of credit counseling]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle [MNB Signature declaration]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 [MNB Certificate of credit counseling]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 [MNB Signature declaration]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle [none]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 [none]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle [MNB Voluntary chapter 13 petition (fee)]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 [MNB Voluntary chapter 13 petition (fee)]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.mnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?465945
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =