open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota

MINNESOTA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:20-40436
    Party Name:David John Parsons
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:April 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle [MNB Minutes re: Ch 13]
    Date Published:April 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle [MNB Order confirming chapter 13 plan (fees)]
    Date Published:April 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle [MNB Notice of rescheduled meeting of creditors]
    Date Published:March 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle [BNC Certificate of mailing - Meeting of creditors]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Ch 13 Plan]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle [MNB Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [MNB Notice of debtor's prior filings]
    Date Published:February 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [MNB Certificate of completion of financial management course]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [MNB Application for compensation preconfirmation Ch 13]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [MNB Add creditor to matrix]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [none]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [MNB Income records of Debtor (payment advices)]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [MNB Notice of responsibilities of chapter 13 debtors and their attorneys]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [MNB Chapter 13 plan]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [MNB Certificate of credit counseling]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [MNB Signature declaration]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [MNB Voluntary chapter 13 petition (fee)]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.mnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?465944
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =