open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota

MINNESOTA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:20-40435
    Party Name:Jodie Lynn Zellmer
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Seaver, Randall L. [MNB AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:May 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Seaver, Randall L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:May 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Seaver, Randall L. [MNB Discharge of debtor (Auto)]
    Date Published:May 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Seaver, Randall L. [MNB Ch 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
    Date Published:April 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Seaver, Randall L. [MNB Certificate of completion of financial management course]
    Date Published:March 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Seaver, Randall L. [BNC Certificate of mailing - Meeting of creditors]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Seaver, Randall L. [MNB Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Seaver, Randall L. [MNB Amended disclosure of compensation of attorney for debtor]
    Date Published:February 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [MNB Amended disclosure of compensation of attorney for debtor]
    Date Published:February 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [MNB Notice of debtor's prior filings]
    Date Published:February 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [MNB Add creditor to matrix]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [MNB Third party guaranty for payment of attorney fees]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [none]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [MNB Signature declaration]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [MNB Income records of Debtor (payment advices)]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [MNB Notice of responsibilities of chapter 7 debtors and their attorneys]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [MNB Voluntary chapter 7 petition (fee)]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [MNB Certificate of credit counseling]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.mnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?465943
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =