U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Minnesota

minnesota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Minnesota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-41241
  • Case Name: Loretta Lynn Hass and Craig Leon Hass
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [Notice of appearance and request for notice]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [Certificate of Financial-Management Course Completion]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [BNC Certificate of mailing - Meeting of creditors]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Ch 13 Plan]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [Add creditor to matrix]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [none]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition - case upload]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [Chapter 13 Plan - case upload]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [Credit Counseling Certificate - case upload]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [Notice of Responsibilities of Chapter 13 Debtors and Their Attorneys - case upload]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [Payment Advices Coversheet - case upload]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [Income Records of Debtor(s) - case upload]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [Statement of Social Security Number - case upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.