U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Minnesota

minnesota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Minnesota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-41251
  • Case Name: Jane Frances Nielson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [Notice of Deficient Claim]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [BNC Certificate of mailing - Meeting of creditors]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Ch 13 Plan]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [none]
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [Add creditor to matrix]
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [Credit Counseling Certificate]
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [Notice of Responsibilities of Chapter 13 Debtors and Their Attorneys]
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [Payment Advices Coversheet]
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [Income Records of Debtor(s)]
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.