U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Minnesota

minnesota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Minnesota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 0:25-cr-00160-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pastrana
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Bond]
  • May 09, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Continuance]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order Appointing Attorney]
  • April 29, 2025: [Arraignment Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 28, 2025: [Brady Obligation Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.