U.S. Federal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 16-00648-
  • Case Name: Gertrude Morgan Crudup
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
June, 2016
  • June 23, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Stephen [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • June 23, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Stephen [BNC Certificate of Mailing-Order Closing Case]
  • June 21, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Stephen [Closing Case (ALL CHAPTERS)]
  • June 21, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Stephen [Discharging Debtor(s)]
May, 2016
  • May 25, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Stephen [BNC Certificate of Mailing (Requirement to file Official Form 423 form)]
  • May 22, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Stephen [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
April, 2016
  • April 08, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Stephen [Meeting of Creditors Held with Proceeding Memo]
  • April 08, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Stephen [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
March, 2016
  • March 05, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Stephen [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 03, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Stephen [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • March 01, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Stephen [Case Administrator Assigned - Multiple Docket]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.