U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-00007-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rosado
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2016
  • September 20, 2016: [Transcript - Redacted]
  • September 15, 2016: [Order on Motion to Redact Transcript]
  • September 15, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Redact Transcript]
  • August 30, 2016: [Seal]
  • August 30, 2016: [Notice of Intent to Request Redaction re Transcript]
  • August 23, 2016: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
  • August 17, 2016: [Judgment Returned Executed]
June, 2016
  • June 24, 2016: [Judgment]
  • June 24, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 23, 2016: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit - Court]
  • June 23, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 23, 2016: [Sentencing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.