U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:00-cr-00141-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Spicer et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Reply to Response]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 27, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • December 21, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 20, 2021: [Response]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 15, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • November 15, 2021: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • November 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal or Restrict]
  • November 14, 2021: [Seal or Restrict]
  • November 10, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 10, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
May, 2021
  • May 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • May 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Withdraw Document]
  • April 26, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 26, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 23, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
  • April 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 15, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 05, 2021: [Order]
  • April 05, 2021: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
June, 2019
  • June 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
May, 2019
  • May 21, 2019: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
January, 2019
  • January 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • January 10, 2019: [Docket Annotation]
  • January 10, 2019: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Order]
June, 2016
  • June 24, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.