U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:12-cr-00070-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Coker
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Appeal Remark]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
March, 2017
  • March 03, 2017: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 26, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • January 26, 2017: [Order]
  • January 26, 2017: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
August, 2016
  • August 22, 2016: [Reply to Response]
  • August 15, 2016: [Response]
July, 2016
  • July 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 07, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
June, 2016
  • June 28, 2016: [Order]
  • June 24, 2016: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
  • June 24, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.