U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:12-cr-00118-10
  • Case Name: USA v. Townsend et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 04, 2024: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 04, 2024: [Restricted Document]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order to Reduce Sentence - 2023 USSC Amendment 821]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Letter]
September, 2022
  • September 02, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Letter]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Order on Report re: Probation/Supervised Release (35)]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Order]
  • September 19, 2019: [Letter]
April, 2019
  • April 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
January, 2019
  • January 17, 2019: [Reconsideration]
November, 2018
  • November 01, 2018: [Reconsideration]
July, 2018
  • July 17, 2018: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • June 26, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • June 07, 2018: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
  • May 30, 2018: [Order]
  • May 29, 2018: [Order]
  • May 08, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 02, 2018: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
April, 2018
  • April 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Ex Parte]
  • April 13, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • April 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • April 11, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 09, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 09, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 02, 2018: [Mail Returned]
March, 2018
  • March 28, 2018: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • March 28, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • March 23, 2018: [Response]
  • March 15, 2018: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • March 14, 2018: [Order]
  • March 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • March 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
February, 2018
  • February 09, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 09, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Reply to Response]
  • November 16, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 07, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • November 07, 2017: [Response in Opposition]
October, 2017
  • October 12, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 05, 2017: [Letter]
September, 2017
  • September 19, 2017: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • September 08, 2017: [Order]
  • September 08, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • September 08, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2017
  • August 10, 2017: [Order]
  • August 08, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • August 08, 2017: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • August 08, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 04, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 04, 2017: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • August 04, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • August 04, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 04, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 03, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 03, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2017
  • July 28, 2017: [Response]
June, 2017
  • June 06, 2017: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
  • June 02, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 02, 2017: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Order]
  • May 04, 2017: [Order]
  • May 04, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • May 04, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
April, 2017
  • April 26, 2017: [Restricted Document]
  • April 26, 2017: [Order]
  • April 25, 2017: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
  • April 24, 2017: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
  • April 21, 2017: [Order]
  • April 19, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 17, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 11, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 11, 2017: [Certificate of Appealability]
  • April 11, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2017
  • March 24, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 24, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • March 24, 2017: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • March 24, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 24, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 24, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 24, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 22, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 08, 2017: [Order on Petition re: Probation/Supervised Release (12B)]
February, 2017
  • February 17, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • February 15, 2017: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • February 15, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
November, 2016
  • November 09, 2016: [Response]
  • November 02, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • November 02, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • November 02, 2016: [Response]
October, 2016
  • October 04, 2016: [Restricted Document]
  • October 04, 2016: [Order Reducing Sentence - USSC Amendment]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Order]
  • September 30, 2016: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • September 06, 2016: [Mail Returned]
August, 2016
  • August 19, 2016: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
  • August 19, 2016: [Copy of Opinion - USCA]
  • August 03, 2016: [USCA Order]
June, 2016
  • June 24, 2016: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
  • June 24, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.