U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:12-cr-00079-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Craft, Jr.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: [Order on Petition re: Probation/Supervised Release (12B)]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
  • June 29, 2018: [Order on Petition re: Probation/Supervised Release (12B)]
July, 2017
  • July 13, 2017: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
  • July 11, 2017: [Appeal Remark]
  • July 06, 2017: [Appeal Remark]
  • July 06, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
June, 2017
  • June 21, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • June 21, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • June 21, 2017: [Certificate of Appealability]
  • June 21, 2017: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • June 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2017
  • April 05, 2017: [Reply to Response]
  • April 03, 2017: [Response]
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2016
  • August 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 08, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2016
  • July 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 15, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Order]
  • June 27, 2016: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
  • June 27, 2016: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • June 24, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.