U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:12-cr-00091-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Vaca-Murillo
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2017
  • September 27, 2017: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
  • September 06, 2017: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
  • September 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Appeal Remark]
  • August 30, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • August 22, 2017: [Certificate of Appealability Denied]
  • August 22, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • August 22, 2017: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
August, 2016
  • August 28, 2016: [Reply to Response]
  • August 26, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 23, 2016: [Response]
  • August 22, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • August 22, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • August 19, 2016: [Response in Opposition]
July, 2016
  • July 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 12, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Order]
  • June 27, 2016: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
  • June 27, 2016: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • June 24, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.