U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00003-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pivaral-Deleon
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2017
  • May 25, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 25, 2017: [Dismiss]
January, 2017
  • January 19, 2017: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • January 09, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
October, 2016
  • October 04, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Continue]
July, 2016
  • July 13, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 13, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
June, 2016
  • June 24, 2016: [Continue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.