U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00001-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dan
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 29, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 23, 2022: [Order]
  • November 09, 2022: [Restricted Document]
  • November 09, 2022: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • November 09, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • November 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • November 07, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • November 07, 2022: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal or Restrict Document]
  • November 01, 2022: [Seal or Restrict Document]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 21, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 05, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 05, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Order]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order]
  • September 27, 2022: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 27, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
July, 2019
  • July 03, 2019: [Order]
June, 2019
  • June 20, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
May, 2019
  • May 01, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
December, 2016
  • December 07, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
November, 2016
  • November 22, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 17, 2016: [Judgment]
  • November 15, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts on Government Motion]
  • November 15, 2016: [Order]
  • November 14, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 14, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • November 14, 2016: [Sentencing]
September, 2016
  • September 15, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 07, 2016: [Continue]
August, 2016
  • August 08, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 08, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 08, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 08, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 08, 2016: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • August 08, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
July, 2016
  • July 13, 2016: [Order]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 24, 2016: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.