U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:04-cr-00135-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Netherland
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2017
  • February 17, 2017: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
  • February 17, 2017: [USCA Order]
September, 2016
  • September 16, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2016
  • August 15, 2016: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
  • August 08, 2016: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
  • August 04, 2016: [Transcript - Appeal]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Transcript Request - Appeal]
  • July 21, 2016: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • July 20, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 19, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 19, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 28, 2016: [Waiver]
  • June 27, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 27, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 27, 2016: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • June 27, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 24, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.