U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:13-cr-00092-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sanchez-Sorto
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2017
  • September 19, 2017: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
August, 2017
  • August 07, 2017: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
  • August 01, 2017: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
July, 2017
  • July 05, 2017: [Certificate of Appealability Denied]
May, 2017
  • May 04, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • April 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [Reply to Response]
  • March 15, 2017: [Response in Opposition]
  • March 08, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2017
  • February 17, 2017: [Order]
June, 2016
  • June 24, 2016: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
  • June 24, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.