U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:06-cr-00131-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Adams
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 10, 2018: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
August, 2017
  • August 29, 2017: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
  • August 18, 2017: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
July, 2017
  • July 12, 2017: [Certificate of Appealability Denied]
May, 2017
  • May 11, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • May 04, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
April, 2017
  • April 25, 2017: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • April 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 25, 2017: [Reply to Response]
  • April 20, 2017: [Response in Opposition]
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 06, 2017: [Order]
  • March 03, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • March 03, 2017: [Response]
  • March 02, 2017: [Order]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Letter]
June, 2016
  • June 28, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 28, 2016: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
  • June 24, 2016: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
  • June 24, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.