U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:03-cr-00030-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Edmond et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 01, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 01, 2025: [Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
  • March 27, 2025: [Copy of Opinion - USCA]
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • May 04, 2022: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 04, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • March 29, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • March 25, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • March 25, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 21, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • March 14, 2022: [Reconsideration]
  • March 07, 2022: [Certificate of Appealability]
  • March 07, 2022: [Judgment - 2255]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Clarify]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • March 03, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order of Recusal]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • February 22, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 03, 2022: [Restricted Document]
  • January 03, 2022: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • January 03, 2022: [Recusal]
December, 2021
  • December 31, 2021: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
  • December 13, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
September, 2021
  • September 09, 2021: [Clarify]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Letter]
March, 2021
  • March 08, 2021: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
November, 2020
  • November 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • October 19, 2020: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
  • October 16, 2020: [Response in Support]
  • October 15, 2020: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
  • October 15, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 13, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 12, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • October 05, 2020: [Response in Support]
  • October 05, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • October 05, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
September, 2020
  • September 14, 2020: [Seal or Restrict Document]
  • September 14, 2020: [Expedite]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 31, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 17, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • August 04, 2020: [Seal or Restrict]
  • August 04, 2020: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • August 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 03, 2020: [Docket Annotation]
  • August 03, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 23, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • July 20, 2020: [Response in Support]
  • July 13, 2020: [Docket Annotation]
  • July 10, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 06, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • June 30, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 30, 2020: [Substitute Attorney]
  • June 29, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 29, 2020: [Order]
  • June 29, 2020: [Memorandum in Support]
  • June 29, 2020: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • June 01, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
May, 2020
  • May 21, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 15, 2020: [Compel]
  • May 11, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 11, 2020: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
August, 2018
  • August 20, 2018: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
July, 2017
  • July 20, 2017: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • July 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Certificate of Appealability]
  • July 20, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: [Response in Opposition]
March, 2017
  • March 13, 2017: [Response to Order]
  • March 10, 2017: [Status Report]
  • March 09, 2017: [Status Report]
  • March 07, 2017: [Order]
  • March 07, 2017: [Certificate of Appealability Denied]
  • March 02, 2017: [Order]
  • March 01, 2017: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • March 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2016
  • December 02, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2016
  • November 21, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 14, 2016: [Certificate of Appealability]
  • November 04, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2016
  • August 23, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 23, 2016: [Certificate of Appealability]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
June, 2016
  • June 24, 2016: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.