U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:07-cr-00050-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Meece
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 02, 2021: [Remark]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [USCA Order]
October, 2019
  • October 03, 2019: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
September, 2019
  • September 10, 2019: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • September 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • September 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
July, 2019
  • July 24, 2019: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: [Response in Opposition]
  • April 25, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • April 25, 2017: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • April 05, 2017: [Unseal Document]
March, 2017
  • March 13, 2017: [Mail Returned]
  • March 06, 2017: [Order]
  • March 02, 2017: [Response]
  • March 02, 2017: [Response to Order]
  • March 02, 2017: [Order]
  • March 02, 2017: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • March 02, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2016
  • August 09, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2016
  • June 27, 2016: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
  • June 27, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.