U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-00046-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Williams
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2016
  • September 20, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 19, 2016: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit - Court]
  • September 19, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
July, 2016
  • July 11, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 08, 2016: [Continue]
  • July 07, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 28, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • June 28, 2016: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • June 28, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 28, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 28, 2016: [Order]
  • June 27, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 27, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.