U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:07-cr-00013-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Harrison
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 06, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
March, 2022
  • March 08, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 08, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • March 08, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • March 08, 2022: [Consent By Videoconference]
  • March 08, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 08, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2021
  • March 11, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
February, 2020
  • February 06, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
January, 2020
  • January 17, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 15, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 10, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 10, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 10, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • January 10, 2020: [Docket Annotation]
  • January 10, 2020: [Digital Audio File]
  • January 10, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 10, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • January 09, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2017
  • April 03, 2017: [Mail Returned]
March, 2017
  • March 08, 2017: [Order]
  • March 08, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 08, 2017: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • March 08, 2017: [Order on Restricted Motion]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Remark]
June, 2016
  • June 27, 2016: [Restricted Motion]
  • June 27, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 27, 2016: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.