U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cr-00032-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Summers
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Mail Returned]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • January 03, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Reconsideration]
  • December 02, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • November 03, 2021: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 15, 2021: [Reply to Response]
  • October 04, 2021: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • October 04, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • September 20, 2021: [Attachment]
  • September 17, 2021: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
February, 2021
  • February 01, 2021: [Change of Address]
  • February 01, 2021: [Letter]
December, 2020
  • December 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • December 07, 2020: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • December 07, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • December 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • December 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 01, 2020: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • December 01, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 01, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 23, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 10, 2020: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 09, 2020: [Order]
  • November 09, 2020: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
December, 2019
  • December 13, 2019: [Restricted Document]
  • December 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
October, 2019
  • October 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • October 15, 2019: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
September, 2019
  • September 13, 2019: [Order]
  • September 12, 2019: [Order]
August, 2019
  • August 15, 2019: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
July, 2019
  • July 12, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2018
  • November 14, 2018: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
  • November 14, 2018: [Copy of Opinion - USCA]
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: [Remark]
  • October 17, 2018: [Appeal Remark]
  • October 16, 2018: [Appeal Remark]
April, 2018
  • April 13, 2018: [Letter]
  • April 13, 2018: [Appeal Remark]
March, 2018
  • March 23, 2018: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • March 21, 2018: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • March 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 07, 2018: [Change of Address]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Transcript Request]
  • February 22, 2018: [USCA Order]
  • February 16, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 16, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
January, 2018
  • January 04, 2018: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
December, 2017
  • December 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 05, 2017: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 05, 2017: [USCA Order]
  • December 04, 2017: [Order on Motion to Clarify]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
  • October 06, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 06, 2017: [Appeal Remark]
  • October 02, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
September, 2017
  • September 25, 2017: [Clarify]
  • September 11, 2017: [Restricted Document]
  • September 11, 2017: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
November, 2016
  • November 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • November 17, 2016: [Order]
  • November 16, 2016: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • November 07, 2016: [Mail Returned]
September, 2016
  • September 15, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
June, 2016
  • June 27, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.