U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cr-00059-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Miller
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 20, 2021: [Letter]
November, 2020
  • November 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 02, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 22, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2019
  • July 15, 2019: [Mail Returned]
  • July 08, 2019: [Mail Returned]
  • July 02, 2019: [Restricted Document]
  • July 02, 2019: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • July 01, 2019: [Mail Returned]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: [Docket Annotation]
  • June 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 18, 2019: [Continue]
  • June 18, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 18, 2019: [Mail Returned]
  • June 07, 2019: [Order]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
February, 2018
  • February 02, 2018: [Certificate of Appealability]
  • February 02, 2018: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Reply to Response]
December, 2017
  • December 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 22, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 06, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 06, 2017: [Response]
November, 2017
  • November 08, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • November 08, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 07, 2017: [Affidavit]
October, 2017
  • October 10, 2017: [Order]
  • October 10, 2017: [Change of Address]
  • October 10, 2017: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
August, 2016
  • August 04, 2016: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
July, 2016
  • July 13, 2016: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • July 13, 2016: [USCA Order]
  • July 08, 2016: [Unseal Document]
June, 2016
  • June 27, 2016: [Letter]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.