U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cr-00064-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Etheredge et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Remark]
June, 2021
  • June 04, 2021: [Remark]
  • June 04, 2021: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Remark]
  • May 14, 2021: [Remark]
  • May 14, 2021: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
June, 2016
  • June 27, 2016: [Judgment Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.