U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:12-cr-00143-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Macklin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: [Response in Support]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 26, 2021: [Continue]
June, 2021
  • June 16, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 14, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • June 14, 2021: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • June 14, 2021: [Order]
  • June 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • June 11, 2021: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • June 11, 2021: [Response]
  • June 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 02, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Order]
  • May 24, 2021: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • May 24, 2021: [Letter]
June, 2016
  • June 28, 2016: [Letter]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.