U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:07-cr-00073-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Clay
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • March 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • March 02, 2021: [Restricted Document]
  • March 02, 2021: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • March 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • March 01, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
  • March 01, 2021: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • February 16, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • February 16, 2021: [Substitute Attorney]
  • February 12, 2021: [Order]
  • February 12, 2021: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
January, 2020
  • January 14, 2020: [Writ of Certiorari Denied - Supreme Court]
July, 2019
  • July 16, 2019: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
  • July 16, 2019: [Copy of Opinion - USCA]
September, 2017
  • September 08, 2017: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
August, 2017
  • August 23, 2017: [Appeal Remark]
  • August 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 21, 2017: [Order on Motion to Compel]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 31, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • July 11, 2017: [Order]
  • July 11, 2017: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
April, 2017
  • April 04, 2017: [Compel]
October, 2016
  • October 04, 2016: [Reply to Response]
September, 2016
  • September 14, 2016: [Response]
August, 2016
  • August 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 17, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
July, 2016
  • July 08, 2016: [Letter]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Order]
  • June 28, 2016: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.