U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-00001-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McKnight
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 04, 2018: [Order on Petition re: Probation/Supervised Release (12B)]
October, 2017
  • October 20, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
April, 2017
  • April 06, 2017: [Order on Petition re: Probation/Supervised Release (12B)]
August, 2016
  • August 17, 2016: [Judgment Returned Executed]
June, 2016
  • June 28, 2016: [Judgment]
  • June 28, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 28, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 28, 2016: [Sentencing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.