U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:09-cr-00100-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Bishop et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 20, 2021: [Consent By Videoconference]
  • September 20, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 20, 2021: [Order]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 29, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 29, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • June 29, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • June 29, 2021: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • June 29, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 29, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 29, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • June 28, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Order on Petition re: Probation/Supervised Release (12B)]
November, 2017
  • November 07, 2017: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
April, 2017
  • April 12, 2017: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
March, 2017
  • March 09, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • March 09, 2017: [Certificate of Appealability Denied]
  • March 09, 2017: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
February, 2017
  • February 15, 2017: [Reply to Response]
  • February 13, 2017: [Response in Opposition]
  • February 03, 2017: [Reply to Response]
  • February 01, 2017: [Response in Opposition]
January, 2017
  • January 04, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 03, 2017: [Order]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Order]
August, 2016
  • August 09, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2016
  • June 28, 2016: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.