U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00047-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Woods
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2017
  • March 01, 2017: [Judgment]
  • March 01, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
February, 2017
  • February 22, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 22, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • February 22, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 22, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • February 22, 2017: [Sentencing]
December, 2016
  • December 14, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
  • December 01, 2016: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 30, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 30, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 30, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 03, 2016: [Rebuttal]
  • November 02, 2016: [Response in Opposition]
October, 2016
  • October 20, 2016: [Suppress]
September, 2016
  • September 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 02, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • September 02, 2016: [Continue]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 26, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
  • August 26, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 23, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • August 22, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 22, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • August 22, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 22, 2016: [Waiver]
  • August 22, 2016: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • August 22, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • August 22, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 22, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 03, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
June, 2016
  • June 28, 2016: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • June 28, 2016: [Restricted Document]
  • June 28, 2016: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.