U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:03-cr-00023-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Leach et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
January, 2021
  • January 27, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Letter]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Order]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Change of Address]
  • April 24, 2019: [Expedite]
April, 2018
  • April 19, 2018: [Affidavit]
March, 2018
  • March 19, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 19, 2018: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
March, 2017
  • March 20, 2017: [Remark]
December, 2016
  • December 02, 2016: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
  • December 02, 2016: [Copy of Opinion - USCA]
September, 2016
  • September 15, 2016: [Order]
June, 2016
  • June 28, 2016: [Appeal Remark]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.