U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-00048-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ly
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2017
  • April 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 12, 2017: [Dismiss]
December, 2016
  • December 09, 2016: [Continue]
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
October, 2016
  • October 11, 2016: [Continue]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
August, 2016
  • August 15, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • August 12, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • August 12, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 12, 2016: [Continue]
  • August 02, 2016: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
July, 2016
  • July 12, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
  • July 01, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 29, 2016: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • June 28, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 28, 2016: [Bond]
  • June 28, 2016: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • June 28, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • June 28, 2016: [Waiver]
  • June 28, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 28, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • June 28, 2016: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • June 28, 2016: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.