U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-00030-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ly
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2017
  • July 21, 2017: [Transcript - Redacted]
June, 2017
  • June 05, 2017: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
May, 2017
  • May 15, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 12, 2017: [Notice of Intent to Request Redaction re Transcript]
  • May 10, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 09, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 09, 2017: [Withdraw Document]
  • May 05, 2017: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • May 04, 2017: [Transcript Request - Appeal]
  • May 04, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 03, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Appeal Remark]
  • April 20, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 20, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • April 17, 2017: [Judgment]
  • April 17, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 12, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 12, 2017: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • April 12, 2017: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit - Court]
  • April 12, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • April 12, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • April 12, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 11, 2017: [Continue]
  • April 10, 2017: [In Limine]
March, 2017
  • March 16, 2017: [Continue]
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • December 20, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 20, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 20, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 20, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 19, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 07, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 07, 2016: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
October, 2016
  • October 11, 2016: [Continue]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
August, 2016
  • August 12, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • August 12, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 12, 2016: [Continue]
  • August 02, 2016: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
July, 2016
  • July 12, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
  • July 01, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 29, 2016: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • June 28, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 28, 2016: [Bond]
  • June 28, 2016: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • June 28, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • June 28, 2016: [Waiver]
  • June 28, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 28, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • June 28, 2016: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • June 28, 2016: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.