U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:13-cr-00023-3
  • Case Name: USA v. Flores et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 12, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2020
  • October 07, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Certificate of Appealability]
  • May 29, 2020: [Judgment - 2255]
  • May 29, 2020: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • May 15, 2020: [Order on Petition re: Probation/Supervised Release (12B)]
November, 2019
  • November 13, 2019: [Affidavit]
  • November 13, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 13, 2019: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
  • November 12, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Letter]
  • July 29, 2019: [Letter]
November, 2018
  • November 09, 2018: [Letter]
October, 2018
  • October 25, 2018: [Letter]
  • October 10, 2018: [USCA Order]
  • October 03, 2018: [Appeal Record Returned]
  • October 01, 2018: [Copy of Opinion - USCA]
  • October 01, 2018: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
March, 2018
  • March 02, 2018: [Supplemental Record Sent USCA]
February, 2018
  • February 21, 2018: [USCA Order]
January, 2018
  • January 24, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
November, 2017
  • November 17, 2017: [Appeal Remark]
  • November 16, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 16, 2017: [USCA Order]
March, 2017
  • March 20, 2017: [Remark]
January, 2017
  • January 20, 2017: [Appeal Remark]
  • January 06, 2017: [USCA Order]
December, 2016
  • December 13, 2016: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
  • December 07, 2016: [Appeal Remark]
  • December 07, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • December 07, 2016: [Transcript - Appeal]
November, 2016
  • November 04, 2016: [USCA Order]
June, 2016
  • June 28, 2016: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.