U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00004-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Tillman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Amended Judgment]
  • August 05, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
  • August 04, 2016: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • August 01, 2016: [Judgment]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • July 25, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 22, 2016: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • July 22, 2016: [Sentencing]
June, 2016
  • June 28, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.