U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:10-cr-00103-3
  • Case Name: USA v. Brown et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 01, 2020: [Change of Address]
  • April 01, 2020: [Letter]
October, 2018
  • October 11, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 11, 2018: [Dismiss]
February, 2017
  • February 23, 2017: [Certificate of Appealability Denied]
  • February 23, 2017: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
November, 2016
  • November 07, 2016: [Change of Address]
  • November 07, 2016: [Letter]
October, 2016
  • October 27, 2016: [Mail Returned]
  • October 12, 2016: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
June, 2016
  • June 28, 2016: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
  • June 28, 2016: [Copy of Opinion - USCA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.