U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00020-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Williams
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Order on Petition re: Probation/Supervised Release (12B)]
December, 2016
  • December 06, 2016: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
October, 2016
  • October 21, 2016: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
  • October 04, 2016: [Transcript - Redacted]
  • October 04, 2016: [Notice of Intent to Request Redaction re Transcript]
  • October 04, 2016: [Transcript - Appeal]
September, 2016
  • September 23, 2016: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • September 23, 2016: [Transcript Request - Appeal]
  • September 15, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 15, 2016: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • September 14, 2016: [Judgment]
  • September 14, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 08, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 08, 2016: [Sentencing]
June, 2016
  • June 28, 2016: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • June 28, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 28, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 28, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 28, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.