U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cr-00067-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rayborn
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: [Order on Petition re: Probation/Supervised Release (12B)]
March, 2017
  • March 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Forfeiture of Property]
October, 2016
  • October 06, 2016: [Judgment Returned Executed]
July, 2016
  • July 11, 2016: [Judgment]
  • July 07, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
  • July 07, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 07, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 07, 2016: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit - Court]
  • July 07, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • July 06, 2016: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.