U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:14-cr-00020-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Willis
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • September 07, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • September 07, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • September 07, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order to Unseal Document]
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
January, 2021
  • January 11, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • January 11, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • January 11, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • January 11, 2021: [Consent By Videoconference]
  • January 11, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 11, 2021: [Order to Unseal Document]
  • January 08, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 05, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 05, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
August, 2020
  • August 24, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • January 23, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • December 18, 2019: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • December 18, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 17, 2019: [Docket Annotation]
  • December 17, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 17, 2019: [Search Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 13, 2019: [Order]
  • December 13, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 13, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 12, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 12, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • December 12, 2019: [Order to Unseal Document]
April, 2017
  • April 12, 2017: [Order on Petition re: Probation/Supervised Release (12B)]
October, 2016
  • October 12, 2016: [Letter]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Copy of Opinion - USCA]
  • June 29, 2016: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.