U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00022-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Burnside et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 02, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
July, 2022
  • July 04, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
June, 2022
  • June 02, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 12, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • May 12, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 11, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 10, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 10, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 10, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 10, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
February, 2022
  • February 01, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
December, 2016
  • December 08, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
October, 2016
  • October 12, 2016: [Judgment]
  • October 12, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 07, 2016: [Sentencing]
August, 2016
  • August 26, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
July, 2016
  • July 05, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 05, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 05, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.