U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:06-cr-00129-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jefferson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2017
  • March 15, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 14, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • March 09, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • March 09, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 09, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 09, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 09, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
February, 2017
  • February 22, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.