U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:08-cr-00011-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jimison
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 14, 2022: [Transcript Request]
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • September 02, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • September 02, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
August, 2022
  • August 05, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Reply to Response]
  • July 18, 2022: [Leave to File Document]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 28, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 27, 2022: [Reply to Response]
  • June 27, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 07, 2022: [Reply to Response]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • April 04, 2022: [Leave to File Document]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • March 25, 2022: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
  • March 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 17, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 07, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • January 13, 2022: [Restricted Document]
  • January 13, 2022: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • January 13, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • January 12, 2022: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • January 05, 2022: [Order]
  • January 05, 2022: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • July 14, 2021: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
  • July 14, 2021: [Copy of Opinion - USCA]
March, 2021
  • March 16, 2021: [Order]
December, 2020
  • December 10, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • December 09, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • December 08, 2020: [Order]
  • December 08, 2020: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • December 04, 2020: [Restricted Document]
  • December 04, 2020: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • December 04, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • December 04, 2020: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • December 01, 2020: [Attachment]
  • December 01, 2020: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
  • November 23, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • November 20, 2020: [Order]
  • November 20, 2020: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • November 16, 2020: [Transcript Request]
  • November 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 05, 2020: [Letter]
July, 2020
  • July 17, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 17, 2020: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • July 06, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • July 02, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • June 25, 2020: [Letter]
  • June 24, 2020: [Letter]
  • June 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • June 11, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 11, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • June 10, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • June 05, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • June 05, 2020: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Order]
  • May 12, 2020: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • May 09, 2020: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
April, 2020
  • April 24, 2020: [Restricted Document]
  • April 24, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • April 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • April 20, 2020: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • April 17, 2020: [Order]
  • April 15, 2020: [Change of Address]
  • April 15, 2020: [Release from Custody]
December, 2019
  • December 16, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 09, 2019: [Exhibit (Document)]
  • December 09, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • December 09, 2019: [Order Reassigning Case]
July, 2019
  • July 24, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 24, 2019: [Exhibit (Document)]
  • July 24, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • July 08, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
March, 2017
  • March 27, 2017: [Letter]
August, 2016
  • August 29, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 29, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 18, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • August 18, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 16, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 30, 2016: [Copy of Opinion - USCA]
  • June 30, 2016: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.