U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:14-cr-00037-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sanchez et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 07, 2019: [Dismiss]
August, 2017
  • August 18, 2017: [Mail Returned]
  • August 11, 2017: [Certificate of Appealability]
  • August 11, 2017: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
September, 2016
  • September 15, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 15, 2016: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
August, 2016
  • August 02, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 01, 2016: [Order]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.