U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cr-00002-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Middleton
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2016
  • July 13, 2016: [Subpoena Returned]
  • July 12, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 11, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 08, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 06, 2016: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 05, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • June 30, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 30, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 30, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 30, 2016: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 30, 2016: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • June 30, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 30, 2016: [Order to Unseal Document]
  • June 29, 2016: [Order on Petition for Warrant/Summons (12C)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.