U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:12-cr-00017-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Griffin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2017
  • July 06, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Exhibit (Document)]
  • June 29, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • June 26, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 23, 2017: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • June 23, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 23, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
July, 2016
  • July 22, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 22, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 21, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • July 21, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 08, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 07, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 07, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 07, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 07, 2016: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.