U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00068-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wilson et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Unclaimed Exhibits Destroyed]
  • February 01, 2022: [Notice of Disposal of Trial Exhibits]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • November 29, 2021: [Discovery]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Letter]
August, 2021
  • August 03, 2021: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Order]
  • May 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 19, 2021: [Order]
  • May 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 10, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 10, 2021: [Letter]
April, 2021
  • April 15, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 08, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2021
  • March 12, 2021: [Remark]
  • March 09, 2021: [Order Epps Successive]
  • March 09, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 09, 2021: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Letter]
August, 2020
  • August 03, 2020: [Letter]
April, 2020
  • April 17, 2020: [Certificate of Appealability Denied]
  • April 17, 2020: [Judgment - 2255]
  • April 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • April 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
February, 2020
  • February 03, 2020: [Response to Motion]
January, 2020
  • January 13, 2020: [Affidavit]
  • January 07, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 12, 2019: [Order]
  • December 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 11, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 11, 2019: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
October, 2019
  • October 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • September 30, 2019: [Letter]
October, 2018
  • October 05, 2018: [Order]
May, 2018
  • May 14, 2018: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
  • May 14, 2018: [Copy of Opinion - USCA]
October, 2017
  • October 02, 2017: [Transcript - Appeal]
September, 2017
  • September 25, 2017: [Sealed Transcript]
  • September 11, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [USCA Order]
  • August 16, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • August 16, 2017: [Letter]
  • August 09, 2017: [USCA Order]
  • August 07, 2017: [Response]
  • August 02, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
June, 2017
  • June 21, 2017: [Transcript - Redacted]
  • June 15, 2017: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
  • June 12, 2017: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
May, 2017
  • May 23, 2017: [Notice of Intent to Request Redaction re Transcript]
  • May 19, 2017: [Sealed Transcript]
  • May 19, 2017: [Transcript - Appeal]
April, 2017
  • April 11, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 11, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • April 05, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
March, 2017
  • March 29, 2017: [Transcript Request - Appeal]
  • March 21, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • March 20, 2017: [Judgment]
  • March 20, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 06, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • March 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 06, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 06, 2017: [Sentencing]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2016
  • December 19, 2016: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • December 15, 2016: [Order]
  • December 15, 2016: [Jury Verdict (Un-Redacted)]
  • December 15, 2016: [Jury Verdict (Redacted)]
  • December 15, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • December 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
  • December 13, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
  • December 12, 2016: [Jury Trial]
  • December 09, 2016: [Restricted Document]
  • December 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
  • December 08, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
  • December 06, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 05, 2016: [Response]
  • December 01, 2016: [Restricted Document]
  • December 01, 2016: [Order on Motion in Limine]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Rebuttal]
  • November 30, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • November 29, 2016: [Protective Order]
  • November 29, 2016: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 29, 2016: [Restricted Document]
  • November 28, 2016: [Response]
  • November 28, 2016: [In Limine]
  • November 17, 2016: [Order]
  • November 17, 2016: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • November 17, 2016: [Telephone Conference]
  • November 16, 2016: [Brady Materials]
  • November 16, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 16, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • November 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • November 16, 2016: [Leave to File Document]
  • November 02, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2016
  • October 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 12, 2016: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
  • October 04, 2016: [Order]
September, 2016
  • September 27, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • September 14, 2016: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
August, 2016
  • August 11, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 11, 2016: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2016
  • July 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 21, 2016: [Continue]
  • July 21, 2016: [Pretrial Conference]
  • July 19, 2016: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • July 19, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • July 19, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • July 19, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 19, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 19, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 30, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 30, 2016: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.