U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00075-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Randall
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Status Report]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Medical Exam]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Medical Exam]
August, 2022
  • August 01, 2022: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [Status Report]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Status Conference]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 22, 2021: [Substitute Attorney]
  • October 21, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2021
  • January 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 15, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 05, 2021: [Remark]
  • January 05, 2021: [Order Reassigning Case]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Status Report]
August, 2020
  • August 11, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • August 10, 2020: [Sealed Document]
November, 2019
  • November 14, 2019: [Status Report]
May, 2019
  • May 17, 2019: [Status Report]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • August 17, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • August 14, 2017: [Restricted Document]
  • August 08, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • August 01, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
July, 2017
  • July 28, 2017: [Response]
  • July 28, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • July 26, 2017: [In Chambers Conference]
  • July 25, 2017: [Compel]
  • July 25, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 18, 2017: [Continue]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • June 28, 2017: [Trial Order]
  • June 28, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 28, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • June 22, 2017: [Restricted Document]
  • June 22, 2017: [Indictment - Redacted]
May, 2017
  • May 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: [Telephone Conference]
  • April 26, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 25, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 20, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • April 14, 2017: [Continue]
  • April 12, 2017: [Subpoena Returned]
  • April 10, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 07, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 07, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • April 06, 2017: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 03, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2017
  • March 22, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 22, 2017: [Order on Motion in Limine]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 30, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 20, 2017: [Response]
  • January 17, 2017: [Rebuttal]
  • January 17, 2017: [Continue]
  • January 09, 2017: [Response in Opposition]
  • January 03, 2017: [Order]
December, 2016
  • December 29, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 09, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • December 08, 2016: [Order]
October, 2016
  • October 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 18, 2016: [Rebuttal]
  • October 17, 2016: [Continue]
  • October 17, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • October 14, 2016: [Continue]
  • October 11, 2016: [Response]
September, 2016
  • September 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
July, 2016
  • July 21, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 08, 2016: [Continue]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.